AL-NIJAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1)ESOL women only classes: Weekly Wednesday ESOL classes from 10-12pm in Leeds Afghan Education Centre. These ESOL classes are run in partnership with PATH Yorkshire. 2)Weekly Saturday Classes for children aged 5-16 3) Weekly Walks 4) Many workshops are delivered in partnership with other organisations. For example: safeguarding training with Voluntary Action Leeds,First aid, Mental health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £138 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAKEEMA AMIN | Chair | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marya Amin | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Freshta Qaumi | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £681 | £681 | £861 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £138 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 October 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 October 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 500 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 500 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 September 2022 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 October 2024 | 864 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SEX, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MUSLIM WOMEN OF THE SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITIES), TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MUSLIM WOMEN OF THE SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B. INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MUSLIM WOMEN OF THE SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THESE COMMUNITIES; C. PROVIDING REGULAR LESSONS IN READING AND UNDERSTANDING THE QURAN, OPEN TO ALL, TO ENABLE MUSLIMS TO PRACTICE THEIR FAITH IN THE UK AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THEIR FAITH AND CULTURE; D. PROVIDING REGULAR CLASSES FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SEX, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR SOCIAL INCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-3 Sandhurst Avenue
LS8 3QT
LEEDS
LS8 3QT
- Phone:
- 07472314087
- Email:
- hakeemaamin1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window