THE GWENT DISABLED MOTORISTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance to disabled members and others so that they can drive, and also assist in their mobility issues and problems, they my have.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Gloucestershire
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 23 September 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENRY WILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £40 | £40 | £41 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | £40 | £40 | £40 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1983 AMENDED 17 MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE TE WELFARE OF THE DISABLED AND TO ASSIST THEM TO ACIEVE GREATER MOBILITY AND IN FURTHER OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE. TO PROMOTE BETTER DRIVING AMONG DISABLED PERSONS AND TO ADVISE THEM ON PROBLEMS IN CONNECTION WITH VEHICLES FOR THE DISABLED. TO SEEK TO IMPROVE FACILITIES FOR DISABLED PERSONS AND TO THIS END MAINTAIN LIAISON WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH THE DISABLED. TO PROVIDE EITHER ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS, EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL, AND SOCIAL ACTVITIES FOR THE DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GWENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 HOLLINS CLOSE
CHEPSTOW
NP16 5HY
- Phone:
- 01291622105
- Email:
- henry.wills1@virgin.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window