ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL ALUMNI ASSOCIATION, UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support Alumni of Abia State University Medical School in the United Kingdom. Offer grants and Support Educational development to students of Abia State University Medical School. Nigeria. Undertake Medical Educational activities in the United Kingdom and Nigeria. Offer Free Medical services to the less privileged in third world countries. Mentorship of Youths of BAME background in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
Governance
- 21 January 2020: Standard registration
- ABSU MEDICAL ALUMNI (Working name)
- ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL ALUMNI (Previous name)
- ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL ALUMNI UK (Previous name)
- ABSU MEDICAL ALUMNI (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IFEANYI ODINA | Chair | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr AZUBUIKE CHILE | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr OBIANUJU AKPUAKA | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DR CHINEDU UMEADI | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr GLORIA Harrison | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr CHINEDU UDONSI | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|||||||
Gabriel Mba | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|||||||
Dr CHILE OGUGUA | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.43k | £5.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | £10.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 March 2022 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE UNIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 TAMAR CLOSE
WHITEFIELD
MANCHESTER
M45 8SJ
- Phone:
- 07802882782
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window