THE CONVERT MUSLIM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Islamic religion in the United Kingdom for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, public celebration of religious festivals, and producing and/or distributing literature on the Islamic religion to enlighten others about the Islamic religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Kenneth John Barson | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Conor Damien Clifford Murphy | Trustee | 29 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Warren Clementson | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Hibell | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.29k | £70.62k | £74.12k | £44.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.80k | £19.54k | £29.32k | £29.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE SUBJECTS OF ISLAM AND OF CONVERSION TO ISLAM AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THOSE SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Convert Muslim Foundation
45 Oakfield Aenue
Leicester
LE67 9WH
- Phone:
- 07401378632
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window