RURAL EDUCATION NETWORK INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to advance the education of children in Uganda, particularly but not exclusively, to support Willow School specifically by constructing more classroom blocks, community library, boys dormitory and girls dormitory, school dining hall school assembly hall, paying teachers wages and paying for other co-curricular activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Uganda
Governance
- 05 November 2019: CIO registration
- 12 December 2024: Funds received from 1155303 RIVERS OF HOPE INTERNATIONAL
- REN INTL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOREEN PATTISON M. A | Chair | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hockley | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Sage | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.18k | £9.89k | £9.79k | £16.60k | £16.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.77k | £12.24k | £10.37k | £15.48k | £15.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 April 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 April 2024 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2022 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2022 | 334 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN UGANDA, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE PUPILS AT WILLOW SCHOOL, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Sher Afzal Close
Cowley
OXFORD
OX4 2FA
- Phone:
- 07939755914
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window