MUSIC FOR MINIATURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music for Miniatures is a registered charity set up to provide opportunities for children and their families to experience high quality live music. We aim to excite, inspire, delight, and enrich the lives of children through live classical music, regardless of background. Focussing predominantly (but not exclusively) on classical music, our performances are interactive, educational, and inspiring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2019: CIO registration
- MUSIC FOR MINIATURES C.I.C. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Harries | Chair | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Jones MBE | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Jordan | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hargreaves | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hum | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.49k | £52.28k | £46.34k | £16.32k | £71.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.11k | £46.15k | £39.76k | £27.03k | £60.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PROVISION OF INTERACTIVE AND PEDAGOGICAL PERFORMANCES, RECITALS AND CONCERTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Tormarton Road
Marshfield
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN14 8NN
- Phone:
- 07970043026
- Email:
- musicforminiatures@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window