VIVA FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Poverty Alleviation Education Youth Development Prevention of- and Response to Gender-based Violence Promotion of the Arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brazil
- South Africa
Governance
- 15 November 2019: CIO registration
- VIVA FOUNDATION E.V. [GERMANY] (Working name)
- VIVA FOUNDATION OF SOUTH AFRICA (Working name)
- VIVA FOUNDATION OF SOUTH AFRICA, UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Meleney Bough Kriel | Chair | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janina Silinskaute | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121 | £100 | £2.13k | £719 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16 | £48 | £2.13k | £719 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 384 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH AFRICA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY ANY MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH AFRICA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING SUBSIDISED EARLY CHILDHOOD DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES AND DAY CARE, INDEPENDENT EDUCATION AND AFTER-SCHOOL PROGRAMMES. 3.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH AFRICA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY ART FESTIVALS, WORKSHOPS AND TRAINING 3.4 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.41 PROVIDING GRANTS SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO PROMOTE GENDER EQUALITY IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH AFRICA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES ; AND 3.42 . RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES RELATING TO GENDER EQUALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Viva Connect
Portion 8
Farm Louwsbaken
Cullinan
1000
- Phone:
- 07951300827
- Email:
- info@vivafoundation.life
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window