LITTLE STEEPING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall is a centre for a variety of activities for all ages: fortnightly coffee mornings, regular social events such as quizzes, talks, bingo, teas, book club and craft club. The hall is the focus for the annual Fete, Harvest Supper, Macmillan Coffee Morning and Christmas events. The hall is used for Parish Council meetings, FGCT meetings, as a polling station and for our MP's surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 September 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Basil Harwood | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Harris | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Harwood | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Berry | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Law | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Law | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Patterson | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38k | £22.45k | £14.10k | £6.20k | £8.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.99k | £5.15k | £15.30k | £18.00k | £5.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | £10.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 MARCH 1966 AS AMENDED BY ORDER 26 NOVEMBER 2003 AND RESOLUTION PASSED 8 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LITTLE STEEPING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LITTLE STEEPING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE STEEPING VILLAGE HALL
STATION ROAD
LITTLE STEEPING
SPILSBY
PE23 5BQ
- Phone:
- 07586241035
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window