Accounts and annual returns POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 1184464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required