Financial history POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1184464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.25k £4.79k £18.80k £20.50k £34.60k
Total expenditure £9.89k £6.56k £16.86k £20.80k £24.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A