SOUTH NORMANTON SCHOOL OF BOXING AND BOYS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
amatuer boxing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 04 October 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD ADRIAN ASHLEY FROST | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY JOSEPH ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.78k | £13.68k | £18.96k | £1.54k | £6.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.84k | £5.83k | £9.05k | £4.28k | £5.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 FEBRAURY 1981
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 WHITELEAS AVENUE
NORTH WINGFIELD
CHESTERFIELD
S42 5QH
- Phone:
- 07773105049
- Email:
- southnormsob@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window