THE RIFLES WARDROBE AND MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The administration and maintenance of the property belonging to the charity and known as The Wardrobe, at Salisbury, in the County of Wiltshire; and 2 The provision and maintenance of a public museum for the exhibition to the public of documents, artefacts and other items connected with the Former Regiments (the "Regimental Collection").
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 June 2019: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Funds received from 272051 THE RIFLES WARDROBE AND MUSEUM TRUST
- THE WARDROBE & MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Kempley McKnight Alexander Buchan-Smith | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Horace Sherman | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Stuart Maconochie | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARK CHESTER RYLANDS | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR NIGEL JOHN WALKER | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PETER COWELL | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allan Johnson | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES SEWARD PERKINS | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Kenneth Fontana | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES BAILEY | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £52.16k | £126.94k | £91.37k | £110.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £47.30k | £91.03k | £97.56k | £172.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.03k | £25.09k | £4.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE AS FOLLOWS AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: 3.1 THE ADMINISTRATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND KNOWN AS THE WARDROBE, AT SALISBURY, IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE; AND 3.2 THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF DOCUMENTS, ARTEFACTS AND OTHER ITEMS CONNECTED WITH THE FORMER REGIMENTS (THE "REGIMENTAL COLLECTION") SO AS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC, MEMBERS OF THE RIFLES AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS IN THE HISTORY OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SECRETARY TO THE BOARD
THE WARDROBE
58 THE CLOSE
SALISBURY
SP1 2EX
- Phone:
- 01722419419
- Email:
- trust@thewardrobe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window