Financial history SOCIABLES HUB & C.R.E.W.S.

Charity number: 1185428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £112.40k £166.83k £201.90k £243.70k £262.97k
Total expenditure £115.77k £143.79k £204.13k £241.23k £253.95k
Income from government contracts £20.74k N/A N/A £42.12k £70.20k
Income from government grants N/A £64.28k £14.90k N/A N/A