SOCIABLES HUB & C.R.E.W.S.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SociABLEs Hub & C.R.E.W.S. Provide services in support of people (Adults & Children) with Disabilities/Special Needs/Complex Health Problems including Mental Health. We provide Socially Inclusive friendship clubs, specialised independence programmes, trips out, sleepover clubs & short breaks away. We also provide supported work placements & work-based skills training for personal development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £70,200 from 9 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 20 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANITA PICKERING | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANN HUGHES | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK WARRINGTON | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY ANNE COOPER | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH MILLINGTON | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Breakwell | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT SIMON BREAKWELL | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Ann Horton | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Lathe | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Lathe | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.40k | £166.83k | £201.90k | £243.70k | £262.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.77k | £143.79k | £204.13k | £241.23k | £253.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.74k | N/A | N/A | £42.12k | £70.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £64.28k | £14.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
1. “TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE (CHILDREN & ADULTS) FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE (CHILDREN & ADULTS) WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF DISABILITY; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2. “TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND/OR FOR SUPPORTED WORK BASED ACTIVITIES OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL), POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.” IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE THE TRUSTEES WILL HAVE A PARTICULAR FOCUS, WITHOUT LIMITATION, TO PEOPLE (CHILDREN & ADULTS) WITH DISABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sociables Hub and CREWS
Longbank
BEWDLEY
Worcestershire
DY12 2QW
- Phone:
- 01299400655
- Email:
- office@sociableshub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window