FOOD FOR THOUGHT DAVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to alleviate hunger for children, families and the elderly in Daventry District (now West Northants) by providing access to sustainable affordable food. Bringing the community together in an environment where there is no stigma or embarrassment. 4,900 children (plus families) in Daventry District could need this help. We support schools, local community and local businesses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £76,886 from 7 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
155 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 25 July 2019: CIO registration
- Food for Thought West Northamptonshire (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miranda Wixon DL | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
John Brownhill | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Helen Ardel Johnston | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa McCarthy-Dixon MBE | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen West | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Angela Gee | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.34k | £9.87k | £409 | £137.66k | £337.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.03k | £10.09k | £1.44k | £114.48k | £187.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £6.50k | £76.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 25 JUL 2019 AMENDED ON 15 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF SCHOOLCHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS IN THE DAVENTRY CATCHMENT AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FREE HEALTHY AND NUTRITIOUS MEALS DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foundation Building
New Street
Daventry
NN11 4BT
- Phone:
- 07974 919221
- Email:
- fftdaventry@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window