THE CHAZUKA PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 November 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Malawi
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 04 November 2019: CIO registration
- 27 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 27 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1134731 KASUPE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/11/2020 | 03/11/2021 | 03/11/2022 | 03/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.97k | £16.17k | £20.97k | £11.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.27k | £11.94k | £17.93k | £9.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 03 November 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 03 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 03 November 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN THE NKHOTAKOTA REGION OF MALAWI, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND GRANTS TO CHARITIES, SCHOOLS, OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window