THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, HOOK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish of St John the Evangelist, Hook, Hampshire, the whole mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 June 2019: Standard registration
- ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, HOOK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Marion Elizabeth de Quidt | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janine Elizabeth Dunbar | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Frolich | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Wilson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas John Maynes | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Purchase | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Patricia Rose Fulpesi | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lawrence Rudd | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kim Clague | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sarah Frolander | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PAGANUZZI | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Susan Bushman | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kim Geraldine Foster | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.02k | £77.49k | £82.84k | £98.34k | £127.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.47k | £78.08k | £84.60k | £97.42k | £111.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
London Road
Hook
RG27 9EG
- Phone:
- 01256760169
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window