NEWWAVE IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the promotion of good health for the public benefit. This will be facilitated through community delivered fitness programmes and mental health education in the geographical area of Elmbridge borough council and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Rousell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. THIS WILL BE FACILITATED THROUGH COMMUNITY DELIVERED FITNESS PROGRAMMES AND MENTAL HEALTH EDUCATION IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF ELMBRIDGE BOROUGH COUNCIL AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Wave Cross Fit
Unit 9/D
Bramley Hedge Farm
Redhill Road
COBHAM
KT11 1EQ
- Phone:
- 07769277703
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window