Accounts and annual returns DERBY S A M E APPEAL

Charity number: 514309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 07 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 11 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window