Financial history DERBY S A M E APPEAL

Charity number: 514309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £31.21k £4.48k £4.55k £61.81k £29.04k
Total expenditure £8.77k £1.72k £1.57k £1.59k £18.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A