DERBY S A M E APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To acquire, procure or otherwise obtain and supply medical and surgical equipment, medecines, preparations, appliances and apparatus for the hospitals in Derby and South Derbyshire in order to add to the said hospitals' facilities to investigate, diagnose, prevent, relieve and cure sickness and ill health of every kind.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 October 1983: Standard registration
- DERBY SCANNER APPEAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Shama Puri | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Brent | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol-ann Courtney | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lana Akram Faraj | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK John Bagnall | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dominic Clarke | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Rahul Deb | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Russell RUDD | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAMELA LOUISE WOODINGS | Trustee | 28 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
DYAN HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK DAVID SIBBERING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANNE ELIZABETH TURNBULL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.21k | £4.48k | £4.55k | £61.81k | £29.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £1.72k | £1.57k | £1.59k | £18.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 14 APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
TO ACCQUIRE AND SUPPLY MEDICAL AND SURGICAL EQUIPMENT OF ALL TYPES, MEDICINES, PREPARATIONS, APPLIANCES AND APPARATUS FOR THE DERBY GROUP OF HOSPITALS IN ORDER TO ADD TO ITS FACILITIES, TO INVESTIGATE, DIAGNOSE, PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF EVERY KIND (INCLUDING PHYSICAL INJURIES) AND TO PROMOTE HEALTH IN ANY WAY WHICH SHALL BE FOR THE TIME BEING CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
DERBY AND SOUTH DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILTON LODGE
DERBY ROAD
HILTON
DERBY
DE65 5FP
- Phone:
- 01283733301
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window