CHARITY HANDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable activities for needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALI ABBAS | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
KOMAL ZAHRA ALI | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAVERIA FARAZ | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
QAISAR ABBAS BUKHARI | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312 | £70 | £17.83k | £1 | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES SUCH AS TESTING AND TREATMENT CENTRES, AND CLINICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; 2)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Cambria Court
North Star Boulevard
GREENHITHE
DA9 9UG
- Phone:
- 07429025151
- Email:
- aliabbas786_1@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window