EXPERT LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation will support individuals to effectively contribute to policies and decisions that affect them through delivering workshops, training and advocacy and other forms of support to both beneficiaries and those who may have contact with them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,139 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Smith | Chair | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcin Bielecki Mr | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Murphy | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Craig | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark deBower Banham | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shane Robert Britton | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Plumb | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marnie Burden | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Snape | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Mark Neville | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.01k | £155.60k | £122.41k | £158.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.26k | £145.37k | £167.64k | £157.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £24.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND NEED AMONGST PEOPLE SUFFERING SEVERE AND MULTIPLE DISADVANTAGE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO HOMELESSNESS, SUBSTANCE AND ALCOHOL MISUSE, MENTAL ILLNESS, PEOPLE AFFECTED BY THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM, AND VICTIMS OF ABUSE AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, ADVOCACY AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINORIES HOUSE
2-5 MINORIES
LONDON
EC3N 1BJ
- Phone:
- 02078404413
- Email:
- david@expertlink.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window