VERWOOD U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The U3A movement encourages its members to share knowledge and talents with each other in informal learning interest groups. This self help model empowers members to create opportunities to learn in ways that suit them best. As a result, members contribute to a wide range of engaging and stimulating activities in an atmosphere of mutual support and companionship. Members study for enjoyment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Tolley | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE NORTHAM | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD WELLS OBE | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janine Claire Mills | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BENN MORRIS | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.90k | £1 | £6.74k | £10.03k | £18.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.52k | £1.22k | £10.57k | £12.99k | £16.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Oaklands Close
Verwood
BH31 6NZ
- Phone:
- 01202827963
- Email:
- jimu3averwood@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window