DOR L'DOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As detailed in the charity objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Gateshead
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOEL GIDEON DEBSON | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rabbi Jakob Wreschner | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Rabbi Bezalel Jonathan Yodaiken | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.88k | £11.45k | £54.38k | £28.90k | £18.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £420 | £21.56k | £23.13k | £24.04k | £28.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 June 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 June 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARENTING AND ALL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH FAMILY LIFE AND RELATIONSHIPS USING ORTHODOX JEWISH ETHICS AND MORALS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS AND IN ANY OTHER WAY IN WHICH THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dor L'Dor
102 Great Clowes Street
SALFORD
M7 1RN
- Phone:
- 01616602078
- Email:
- admin@dorldor.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window