STEM BRITISH EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To built and run a STEM (Science; Technology, Engineering and Mathematics/Medicine) institute in Multan Pakistan. We believe the best Sadaka-e-Jarya is to provide education to others. The aim is to built Oxbridge/IIT style graduate and post-grad. institute. We intend to start with Computer sciences, Mathematics, Computer/ Data engineering and then gradually expand to other subjects. Dr S Ali FRCS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
- Pakistan
Governance
- 05 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Shaukat Ali FRCS | Chair | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Razzaq | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Usman Ismail Ali Int.Dev.Tr | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fazeel Akhter Ali | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £20 | £2.00k | £3.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82k | £0 | £1.95k | £2.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING TO PROVIDE FOR EDUCATION FROM HIGHER SECONDARY SCHOOL TO AND INCLUDING UNIVERSITY LEVEL IN WAYS WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES; FOCUSED UPON STEM SUBJECTS (SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICS/MEDICINE) EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESEARCH (INCLUDING ALLIED SUBJECTS) FOR STUDENTS IN PAKISTAN BY THE PROVISION OF LAND AND BUILDINGS AND OTHER SUPPORT AND FACILITIES BOTH FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE; 1.2 SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES) AS SHALL BE SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
148 NOTTINGHAM ROAD
RAVENSHEAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 9HL
- Phone:
- 07788403882
- Email:
- shaukat@ali.uk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window