COPING WITH CANCER IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coping with Cancer provide practical and emotional support to those effected by a cancer diagnosis, within Leicester,Leicestershire and Rutland .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 13 October 1983: Standard registration
- 18 February 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 February 2010: Funds transferred to 1124057 SUE YOUNG CANCER SUPPORT IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUT...
- COPING WITH CANCER - C W C (Working name)
- CWC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.27k | £253.88k | £220.59k | £249.63k | £234.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.83k | £230.27k | £182.64k | £181.07k | £203.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 23 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 06 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 07 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 18 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 AUGUST 1983 AS AMENDED 5 MAY 1993, 11 JUNE 1996, 30TH JUNE 1998, 10 JULY 2001 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO THOSE AFFECTED BY A CANCER DIAGNOSIS THEIR FAMILIES AND SUPPORTERS IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window