THE HAIR PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- The relief of people in need, in particular girls and women in India, who are socially and economically disadvantaged by providing them with hairdressing skills, to enable such individuals to generate an income and to rebuild their lives and reintegrate into society. - The relief of financial hardship to homeless people in the UK through the provision of free hairdressing services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 01 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles Robbins | Chair | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Antony Jacob | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR ZAC STEVEN FENNELL | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ELIZABETH ROBBINS | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.46k | £12.88k | £26.69k | £6.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £20.25k | £14.49k | £3.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY GIRLS AND WOMEN IN INDIA, WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BY PROVIDING THEM WITH VOCATIONAL HAIRDRESSING SKILLS, TO ENABLE SUCH INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND TO REBUILD THEIR LIVES AND REINTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO HOMELESS PEOPLE IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE OF CHARGE HAIRDRESSING SERVICES TO MEET THEIR NEED(S).
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SHAW
BRASTED CHART
WESTERHAM
TN16 1LX
- Phone:
- 01959563638
- Email:
- gilesrobbins@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window