COOKRIDGE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities for and organisation of social activities for the residents of Cookridge and the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £7,384 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- 25 October 2022: Funds received from 523557 COOKRIDGE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Dewhurst | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN KATHLEEN TONES | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Sturdy | Trustee | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.23k | £29.19k | £23.68k | £40.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.44k | £22.74k | £23.73k | £27.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.43k | £2.67k | N/A | £7.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COOKRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS OF COOKRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COOKRIDGE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION
COOKRIDGE VILLAGE HALL
MOSELEY WOOD LANE
LEEDS
LS16 7ER
- Phone:
- 01132674706
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window