HAY JUMPING JACKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club is located in Hay-on-Wye Primary School and held in the sports/dining hall. The charity promotes the benefits of the attendees of Hay-on-Wye Primary School and surrounding schools by providing a facility for daily after school care for children age 4 - 11 years. We provide the children with inside and outside activities. We provide healthy snacks, all in a happy, safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Powys
Governance
- 14 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marianne Seymour | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Young | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Davies | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lizzie Keylock | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kath Vaughan | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.45k | £12.73k | £18.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.81k | £10.33k | £14.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FOR THE RECREATION OF CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN 4 AND 11 YEARS BY MAKING SERVICES AND FACILITIES AVAILABLE TO THEM DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAY-ON-WYE CP SCHOOL
OXFORD ROAD
HAY-ON-WYE
HEREFORD
HR3 5BT
- Phone:
- 01497820339
- Email:
- hayjumpingjacks23@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window