Trustees HOLTON LE CLAY PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Charity number: 1184686

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lois Taylor | Chair | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Simpson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Boulger | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Nunn | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Martindale | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Boylan | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Goodhand | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.