KAWANGWARE HUMANITARIAN EDUCATION SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity supports the school in Kawangware in the provision of resources for children, small payment for voluntary teachers, maintenance of the building and food. The trustees visit the school regularly to ensure how money is used and to support and ascertain new projects as needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kenya
Governance
- 29 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Elizabeth Harris B Ed | Chair | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HARRIS | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Oliver Harris | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.72k | £24.74k | £12.69k | £21.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.67k | £6.79k | £6.37k | £5.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF STUDENTS, WHO SUFFER FROM DISABILITIES, ARE ORPHANS OR HOMELESS, ATTENDING KAWANGWARE HUMANITARIAN EDUCATION SCHOOL, NAIROBI, KENYA, TO INCLUDE PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH THE PROVISION OF PREMISES, RESOURCES, FOOD, RUNNING COSTS AND STAFFING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 WOODLAND PARK
PAIGNTON
TQ3 2ST
- Phone:
- 07736714842
- Email:
- dawnharris63@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window