THE REGENERATION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold weekly services which is streamed online. We hold regular teaching and study activities online. We support our members and attendees and other causes, in line with our chartiable objectives,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 2020: CIO registration
- REGEN (Working name)
- REGEN PROJECT (Working name)
- TRP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip John Purkiss Mr | Chair | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barrington Bailey | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorlisa Shontel Purkiss | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARIA CRUZ NEPI LOPETE | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Clarice Bailey | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Marie Bailey | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.33k | £12.92k | £12.80k | £12.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.94k | £13.47k | £14.75k | £10.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN MERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF SOUTH WEST LONDON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND HOLDING RELIGIOUS SERVICES, CEREMONIES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, RAISING AWARENESS OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND CARRYING OUT INTERFAITH ACTIVITIES; * RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE IN POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; * CONTRIBUTING TO FOLLOWERS’ OR ADHERENTS’ GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH; * PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY RAISING AWARENESS OF AND SUPPORTING THOSE WHO ARE DISCRIMINATED AGAINST ON THE GROUNDS OF RACIAL HERITAGE, FAITH, AGE, GENDER OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION INCLUDING RAISING AWARENESS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: * LIFE SKILLS SUCH AS COMMUNICATION, TIME MANAGEMENT AND TEAMWORK * PARENTING AND RELATIONSHIP SKILLS * EMOTIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 BEVERLEY ROAD
WHYTELEAFE
CR3 0DX
- Phone:
- 07900256868
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window