LIGHTWOOD ROAD BOWLING CLUB

Charity number: 1184675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in all wards of Stoke-on-Trent and the surrounding area by providing facilities for playing Crown Green Bowling (facilities means land, buildings, equipment and organising sporting activities).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,280
Total expenditure: £4,740

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norma Bowers Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
John Ayres Trustee 14 November 2019
None on record
Stephen John Clutton Trustee 14 July 2019
None on record
Jamie Ayres Trustee 14 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.77k £15.40k £5.51k £4.28k
Total expenditure £23.70k £9.79k £3.96k £4.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.04k £11.21k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Beaufort Road
Longton
Stoke on Trent
Staffordshire
ST3 1RH
Phone:
07771559778
Website:

No information available