Trustees Friends of Halstead St. Andrew's School
Charity Number: 1184432

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Carolina Desiree Hamilton | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Sarah Jane Ebelthite | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Morgan | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Juliette Hardy | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Dennison | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Schiavo | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Black | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Victoria Dawn Turner | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Anderson | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Morwenna Jane Larive | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Szehofner | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anastasia Sierra-Parkes | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.