Financial history AIMCOMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1185928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023 01/09/2024
Total gross income £151.87k £211.20k £406.35k £477.72k £607.01k
Total expenditure £121.38k £185.43k £248.59k £350.72k £545.96k
Income from government contracts £100.00k £161.24k £352.47k N/A £72.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £39.22k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £54.81k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £549.98k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.22k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £545.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0