FEED UP WARM UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of homeless persons, or those at risk of homelessness, in Hitchin and Stevenage and the surrounding areas by the provision of drop in centres providing food, drink, shelter, warmth, replacement clothing, haircuts, access to footcare, companionship, advice, signposting and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 November 2019: CIO registration
- 22 May 2023: Funds received from 1187735 HITCHIN VOLUNTEER ARMY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Garrell | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard O'Brien | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wills | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.68k | £110.80k | £151.64k | £166.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.57k | £44.86k | £90.57k | £129.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.50k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PERSONS, OR THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, IN HITCHIN AND STEVENAGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF DROP-IN CENTRES PROVIDING FOOD, DRINK, SHELTER, WARMTH, REPLACEMENT CLOTHING, HAIRCUTS, ACCESS TO FOOTCARE, COMPANIONSHIP, ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Our Lady & St. Andrews Church
16 Nightingale Road
Hitchin
SG5 1QS
- Phone:
- 01462459126
- Email:
- contact@feedupwarmup.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window