Trustees PROFESSORS WITHOUT BORDERS
Charity number: 1189091

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Denton | Chair | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Treadway | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kinna Pattani | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Clare Loughlin-Chow | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pernille Norregaard | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamaal Brathwaite | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter James Thomas | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.