LAMBETH STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a Local Initiative of the Global Street Pastor Movement, the mission of Lambeth Street Pastors is to engage, train and mobilise Christian volunteers from different churches, to be relevant in public life, addressing issues of vulnerability and social exclusion through the principle of caring, listening and helping people. Partnering with the police and local authority to achieve our goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 09 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Hugh Coulson | Chair | 05 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
Roger Gregory Reid | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Sackey | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalind Eileen Margaret Hallifax | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Ogbonna | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.36k | £3.93k | £7.50k | £9.21k | £4.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.28k | £5.59k | £5.61k | £6.16k | £5.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION ARE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA OF LAMBETH AND BEYOND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AS FOLLOWS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STREET PASTOR LICENCE AGREEMENT WITH THE “ASCENSION TRUST” THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC PASTORAL CARE SERVICES TO HELP PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND OTHER PUBLIC PLACES, GIVING GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING WHICH ASSIST IN PRESERVING PUBLIC ORDER, AVOID ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AND BY II) ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ECCLESIASTICAL RELEVANCE TO COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC LIFE, MOBILIZING THE CHURCH ECUMENICALLY TO UNITY OF WORSHIP AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY CARRYING OUT THE MISSION AND OUTREACH WORK OF THE GOSPEL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN OUR COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE, THROUGH THE PRACTICAL DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH FORMAL TRAINING, INFORMAL TALKS AND CAPACITY BUILDING IN VOLUNTARY SERVICES, ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND THE STREET
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 Kennington Oval
London
SE11 5SW
- Phone:
- 07931320936
- Email:
- lambeth@streetpastors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window