Trustees SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THEOLOGY
Charity number: 1191603

Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chee Man Tang | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Drew Thomas Everhart | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof Susannah Marguerita Cornwall | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tanya Kundu | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Campbell | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Molyneux-Hetherington | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen O'Donnell | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Nancekievill | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Selina Stone | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Beckford | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CL Nash | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.