BRIGHTSPARKS ARTS IN MENTAL HEALTH CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BrightSparks Arts in Mental Health CIO (BSA) provides creative opportunities for people living with mental health conditions in Leicester/Shire and beyond to enable them to build self esteem, develop skills and challenge stigma. BSA delivers workshops, projects, events, exhibitions and publications to showcase the work of participants, and provides advocacy and advice to organisations/ the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 July 2023
Total income includes £65,680 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naishad Chhatralia | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Leet | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Haynes | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Elliott | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joe Nixon | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Dyer | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/07/2021 | 19/07/2022 | 19/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.77k | £117.66k | £80.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.27k | £67.47k | £87.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.33k | £65.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 July 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 19 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ARTS-BASED ACTIVITIES AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 PERCY ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 8FQ
- Phone:
- 07795475806
- Email:
- office@brightsparksarts.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window