BAKERSFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Bakersfield and the neighbourhood, without distinction of gender, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said inhabitants and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations, in common effort to advance education and to provide facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,485 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 June 2019: CIO registration
- 16 February 2021: Funds received from 517939 BAKERSFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIO...
- BANCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor DAVID MELLEN | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Dr IRFAN MALIK | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
DIANE BALAGUERO | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
MARILYN ANNE LIVESEY | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
CAROL GREAVES | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
JOANNE FLINT | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.42k | £49.85k | £71.66k | £58.73k | £74.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.71k | £52.21k | £60.55k | £74.96k | £71.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.70k | £42.08k | £43.08k | £3.49k | £3.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Jun 2019 as amended on 11 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
A. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BAKERSFIELD, NOTTINGHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAKERSFIELD NEIGHBOURHOOD CA
312 SNEINTON DALE
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 7DN
- Phone:
- 01159480454
- Email:
- mancombanca@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window