CENTRE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian faith by the proclamation of the Gospel and through worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 August 2019: CIO registration
- 11 January 2022: Funds received from 1054436 CENTRE CHURCH
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Harwood | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Kesia Harwood | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rose Gentry | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.33k | £162.12k | £147.56k | £161.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.77k | £152.26k | £127.78k | £103.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, GATHERING IN PUBLIC OR AT OTHER TIMES FOR TEACHING OF THE BIBLE, WORSHIP AND PRAISE, EVANGELISM, STUDY, PRAYER, CHILD AND YOUTH WORK AND COMMUNITY SERVICE; 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS BY ANY MEANS SUCH AS GIFTS, DONATIONS, CONTRIBUTIONS, LOANS AND ADVANCES WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST; 3. TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
180 LEYLANDS ROAD
BURGESS HILL
RH15 8HS
- Phone:
- 01444232596
- Email:
- info@centrechurch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window