Accounts and annual returns ROAD2RECOVERY (UK)

Charity number: 1188837
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 06 March 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 06 March 2025 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 30 July 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 30 July 2024 180 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 13 February 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 25 May 2023 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window