ROAD2RECOVERY (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run charitable events where fundraisers will raise money for the charity alongside working with key stakeholders to generate additional income for the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 March 2020: CIO registration
- ROAD 2 RECOVERY (UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thierry Way | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Wilson | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roddy Lee Brooks | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Kirk Button | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Revel Dobb | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Davies | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.99k | £2.86k | £22.39k | £18 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £21.04k | £20.54k | £937 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MOTOCROSS AND FREESTYLE MOTOCROSS ATHLETES WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LIFE-CHANGING INJURY WHICH IS SERIOUS ENOUGH FOR THEM TO STOP PARTICIPATING IN THEIR SPORT, OR FROM WHICH THEY WILL TAKE A SIGNIFICANT TIME TO RECOVER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Ferguson Road
Walkington
BEVERLEY
HU17 8SL
- Phone:
- 07464033742
- Email:
- info@road2recoveryuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window