BURMA SKINCARE INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of the Burma Skincare Initiative charity is to promote excellence in skincare for the people of Myanmar (Burma) through improving education, training, research and clinical services in the country by working closely with Myanmar and international dermatology communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Burma
Governance
- 03 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Christopher Ernest Maitland Griffiths | Chair | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Su Mar Lwin | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen George Nyuk Sheoung Lue | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.77k | £10.62k | £110 | £971 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.24k | £10.05k | £7.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DERMATOLOGY AND SKINCARE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN MYANMAR, BY: - THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND RESEARCH PROJECTS IN ORDER TO IMPROVE AND SUSTAIN CLINICAL SERVICES - THE PROMOTION OF AWARENESS OF PUBLIC HEALTH EDUCATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 FITZROY SQUARE
LONDON
W1T 5HQ
- Phone:
- 020 7383 0266
- Email:
- contact@burmaskincare.org
- Website:
-
burmaskincare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window