THE NURSLING AND ROWNHAMS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and providing facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants of Nursling and Rownhams by purchasing establishing or securing the establishment of centres land and buildings for community use and to manage maintain or operate such premises for community use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government contract(s) and £47,514 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 January 2020: CIO registration
- N AND R CIO (Working name)
- N&R CIO (Working name)
- Nursling and Rownhams Community Centre (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phil Bundy | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Anne Bradley | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrrew Williams | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Mallen | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Anne Maltby | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Frank Maltby | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.15k | £22.23k | £10.75k | £61.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.36k | £12.31k | £7.85k | £61.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.91k | £11.67k | £9.14k | £47.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NURSLING AND ROWNHAMS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (2)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO PURCHASE ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CENTRES LAND AND BUILDINGS FOR COMMUNITY USE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR COOPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRES LAND AND BUILDINGS FOR COMMUNITY USE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADFIELD
ROWNHAMS LANE
ROWNHAMS
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 8AR
- Phone:
- 02380734992
- Email:
- phil.bundy@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window