FELLING VOLUNTEER LIBRARY

Charity number: 1185205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We facilitate library services by providing a hub of activities for the public in general, mainly focusing on the immediate surrounding of The Felling. These include weekly Rhyme Time for preschoolers, computers with internet access help in looking for employment, applying for Universal Credit etc. Everything we do is centred on improving the local area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,306
Total expenditure: £7,722

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gateshead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 September 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • FELLING COMMUNITY LIBRARY (Working name)
  • FELLING LIBRARY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Patrick Olliffe Wilson Chair 31 May 2019
None on record
Benjamin Thomas Hume Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
KATHLEEN LAVENDER Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
Martin Joseph McKeever Trustee 31 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.03k £23.60k £1.52k £2.34k £2.31k
Total expenditure £1.11k £10.29k £1.37k £9.23k £7.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £21.05k £397 £900 £850

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 November 2024 285 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
58 HIGH STREET
FELLING
GATESHEAD
NE10 9LT
Phone:
01914336402