FOUNDATION FUTURES CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foundation Futures CIO is a specialist teaching and youth service operating in the NE of England. We support young people to find out what they can do instead of what they can't. We support their families and the wider community to improve the lives of young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 30 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP DAVISON MR | Chair | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Kevin Smith | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hall | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Xander Brouwer | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Williamson | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DAVISON MRS | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Dobson | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR ROBERTS | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Bankhead | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.71k | £148.67k | £132.33k | £115.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.91k | £120.96k | £121.16k | £135.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.31k | £2.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE WHO HAVE A DISABILITY, MENTAL HEALTH ISSUE OR A BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTY IN TYNE AND WEAR OR NORTHUMBERLAND WHO ARE NOT IN EMPLOYMENT ARE PERMANENTLY EXCLUDED FROM MAINSTREAM EDUCATION OR A PUPIL REFERRAL UNIT OR AT RISK OF THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; C) ADVANCING EDUCATION. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
POTTERY BANK COMMUNITY CENTRE
YELVERTON CRESCENT
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 3SW
- Phone:
- 07877827854
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window