Accounts and annual returns ASCEND

Charity number: 1187189
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 February 2025 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2024 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 February 2025 386 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time